TN SB2220 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department, in cooperation with the department of mental health and substance abuse services, to study the feasibility of establishing county-level drug overdose fatality review teams; requires the department to report findings and suggestions for legislative changes to the health-related committees of the general assembly by December 15, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 33; Title 53; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 7; Title 33; Title 53; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to measures to prevent overdose deaths.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 4/20/2022 |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Finance, Ways & Means |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate H&W Comm. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/14/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2272 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee