TN SB2220 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises the calculation of cumulative grade point averages for purposes of the Tennessee Promise scholarship; permits appeals of Tennessee Promise scholarship denials or revocations based on calculations of cumulative grade point averages; awards Promise scholarships for 2019–2020 retroactively to certain students based on recalculation of cumulative grade points. - Amends TCA Section 49-4-708 and Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Title
As introduced, revises the calculation of cumulative grade point averages for purposes of the Tennessee Promise scholarship; permits appeals of Tennessee Promise scholarship denials or revocations based on calculations of cumulative grade point averages; awards Promise scholarships for 2019–2020 retroactively to certain students based on recalculation of cumulative grade points. - Amends TCA Section 49-4-708 and Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2305 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Committee