TN SB2213 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the use of corporal punishment against students; deletes various provisions relative to the use of corporal punishment. - Amends TCA Title 36; Title 37; Title 39; Title 41 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36; Title 37; Title 39; Title 41 and Title 49, relative to corporal punishment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2564 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-08 - Failed in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration