TN SB2209 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes each LEA and school that offers a firearm safety class or program to elementary-school students to post the curriculum and any corresponding educational materials on the school's or LEA's website. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, authorizes each LEA and school that offers a firearm safety class or program to elementary-school students to post the curriculum and any corresponding educational materials on the school's or LEA's website. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2761 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-08 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration