TN SB2204 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1042
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1042
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides that a real property owner who prevails in an action challenging the validity of a lien, including in a slander of title proceeding, will recover the person's reasonable attorney's fees, reasonable costs, liquidated damages in an amount equal to 10 percent of the fair market value of the property not to exceed $100,000, and actual damages incurred by the owner; excludes actions brought to challenge lien based on loan agreement for which the encumbered property was listed as collateral to secure the repayment of a loan. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 47; Title 66 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, provides that a real property owner who prevails in an action challenging the validity of a lien, including in a slander of title proceeding, will recover the person's reasonable attorney's fees, reasonable costs, liquidated damages in an amount equal to 10 percent of the fair market value of the property not to exceed $100,000, and actual damages incurred by the owner; excludes actions brought to challenge lien based on loan agreement for which the encumbered property was listed as collateral to secure the repayment of a loan. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 47; Title 66 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1042 | |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Reset on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/18/18 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1926 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1042