TN SB2203 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 940
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 940
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted. requires the county commissioners of counties seeking to change boundary lines to consider the potential impact to all relevant departments before adopting the resolution to request the general assembly change the county boundary lines. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5, Chapter 2, relative to county boundary changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 940 | |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Comittee to 03/29/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2232 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-04 - Effective date(s) 04/29/2022