TN SB2202 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-09 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. E,C&T Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-09 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. E,C&T Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the one-time fee for a lifetime senior citizen sportsman license from $200 to $250. - Amends TCA Section 70-2-201.
Title
As introduced, increases the one-time fee for a lifetime senior citizen sportsman license from $200 to $250. - Amends TCA Section 70-2-201.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-09 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. E,C&T Comm. | |
2009-03-02 | P2C, ref. to S. E,C&T Comm. | |
2009-02-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2345 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-10 - Assigned to s/c Wildlife of CON
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2202&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB2202.pdf |