TN SB2199 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 707
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 707
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes the duty of the governor to proclaim days of special observance, such as Mother's Day, Harriet Tubman Day, and Volunteer Firefighters week; removes the governor's duty to invite the people of the state to observe certain days of special observance such as Andrew Jackson Day. - Amends TCA Title 15, Chapter 2.
Title
As enacted, removes the duty of the governor to proclaim days of special observance, such as Mother's Day, Harriet Tubman Day, and Volunteer Firefighters week; removes the governor's duty to invite the people of the state to observe certain days of special observance such as Andrew Jackson Day. - Amends TCA Title 15, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 707 | |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 6/9/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2266 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 707