TN SB2197 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 763
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 763
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, under the Uniform Debt-Management Services Act, counselors to present evidence of accreditation or certification by an independent accrediting or certifying organization upon registering to provide debt management services. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18, Part 55.
Title
As enacted, requires, under the Uniform Debt-Management Services Act, counselors to present evidence of accreditation or certification by an independent accrediting or certifying organization upon registering to provide debt management services. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18, Part 55.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 763 | |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/4/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1671 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 763