TN SB2194 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends from 10 days to 10 business days the minimum amount of time in which the president of the district public defenders conference must provide notice before a district public defenders conference meeting. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14 and Title 9, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, extends from 10 days to 10 business days the minimum amount of time in which the president of the district public defenders conference must provide notice before a district public defenders conference meeting. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14 and Title 9, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2012 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee