TN SB2194 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows a licensed teacher to work with a student teacher every other school year without negatively affecting the teacher’s evaluation score during that school year; freezes the licensed teacher’s evaluation score at the previous year’s score for the academic year in which a student teacher was trained. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, allows a licensed teacher to work with a student teacher every other school year without negatively affecting the teacher’s evaluation score during that school year; freezes the licensed teacher’s evaluation score at the previous year’s score for the academic year in which a student teacher was trained. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Rep. Rick Womick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2053 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-11 - Failed In s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2194&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB2194.pdf |