TN SB2187 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, provides for the registration of eligible voters upon the submission by the department of safety to the appropriate county election commission of an eligible voter's application for a driver license or photo identification card; establishes methods by which a person may decline to be registered to vote in such a manner. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, provides for the registration of eligible voters upon the submission by the department of safety to the appropriate county election commission of an eligible voter's application for a driver license or photo identification card; establishes methods by which a person may decline to be registered to vote in such a manner. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2306 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback