TN SB2186 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the date the Access Tennessee annual report to the governor and comptroller of the treasury is due from October 1 of each year to December 31 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 29.
Title
As introduced, changes the date the Access Tennessee annual report to the governor and comptroller of the treasury is due from October 1 of each year to December 31 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 29.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2253 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.