TN SB2186 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a person who is licensed to provide deferred presentment services from providing such services to individuals who do not physically appear in-person at the licensee's business address as specified in the licensee's application for licensure. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 17.
Title
As introduced, prohibits a person who is licensed to provide deferred presentment services from providing such services to individuals who do not physically appear in-person at the licensee's business address as specified in the licensee's application for licensure. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2307 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-28 - Failed in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee