TN SB2184 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from $35,000 to $45,000 the amount of state matching funds available to a nonprofit tourist promotion organization engaged in a tourist development project based on the amount of contributions by the local community. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 22.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 22, relative to department of tourist development grant programs and initiatives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2127 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-14 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee