TN SB2183 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 582
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 582
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the CoverKids program from June 30, 2020, to June 30, 2025. - Amends TCA Section 71-3-1113.
Title
As enacted, extends the CoverKids program from June 30, 2020, to June 30, 2025. - Amends TCA Section 71-3-1113.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Pub. Ch. 582 | |
2020-03-26 | Effective date(s) 03/19/2020 | |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-03-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-03-02 | House | Passed H., Ayes 99, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-03-02 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/2/2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2250 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 582