TN SB2180 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires local boards of education to admit students from outside their respective school systems if the LEA to which the student is transferring has the available space; requires local boards of education to arrange for the transfer of students residing in their district to schools located outside of their district. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, requires local boards of education to admit students from outside their respective school systems if the LEA to which the student is transferring has the available space; requires local boards of education to arrange for the transfer of students residing in their district to schools located outside of their district. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Amend# 1 by Johnson (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Rule 39(3) Motion to Adopt Amend# 1 by Johnson (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Rule 39(3) Motion to Adopt Amend# 1 by Johnson (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0579) |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Failed to adopt, Ayes 14, Nays 16 (Amendment 1 - SA0578) |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Failed to adopt, Ayes 17, Nays 12 (Amendment 1 To 1 - SA0582) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/9/2020 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/9/2020 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/2/2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2869 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Committee