TN SB2179 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires county clerks to remit to the commissioner, instead of commissioner or commissioner's designee, the remaining $5.50 of the $10.00 issuance fee received by county clerks for issuing temporary operation permits; authorizes commissioner's designee to issue temporary trailer permits. - Amends TCA Section 55-4-115.
Title
As introduced, requires county clerks to remit to the commissioner, instead of commissioner or commissioner's designee, the remaining $5.50 of the $10.00 issuance fee received by county clerks for issuing temporary operation permits; authorizes commissioner's designee to issue temporary trailer permits. - Amends TCA Section 55-4-115.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2248 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-17 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020