TN SB2176 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/14/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/14/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes authority of the department of safety to deny a license to a minor for unsatisfactory academic progress; retains provisions for denial of a license, with certain exceptions, to a minor when the person is a student who is not enrolled in school. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 30 and Title 55, Chapter 50.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 30 and Title 55, Chapter 50, relative to driver licenses for minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Effective date(s) 04/14/2022 | |
2022-04-26 | Pub. Ch. 878 | |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-04-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0723) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/4/2022 |
2022-03-31 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-31 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0723) |
2022-03-31 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-03-10 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/7/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2037 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 878