TN SB2174 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that students in grades six through eight complete a financial literacy course. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to financial literacy instruction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/19/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2294 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-12 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration