TN SB2172 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 770
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 770
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the state board of education and the department to support and encourage LEAs in the creation of communities of schools; authorizes LEAs and schools to form community consortiums with a variety of community partners to establish communities of schools; enacts other provisions relative to community schools. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 24.
Title
As enacted, requires the state board of education and the department to support and encourage LEAs in the creation of communities of schools; authorizes LEAs and schools to form community consortiums with a variety of community partners to establish communities of schools; enacts other provisions relative to community schools. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 24.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Pub. Ch. 770 | |
2016-04-26 | Effective date(s) 04/19/2016 | |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-04 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-04-04 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0722) |
2016-04-04 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-03-31 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0879) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2236 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 770