TN SB2168 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from August 1 to July 31, the date by which the name, address, and telephone number of persons designated to check buses transporting children with disabilities for such children must be supplied to the LEA each year. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 49 and Title 55.
Title
As introduced, changes, from August 1 to July 31, the date by which the name, address, and telephone number of persons designated to check buses transporting children with disabilities for such children must be supplied to the LEA each year. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 49 and Title 55.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Education Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2511 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee