TN SB2167 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Uniform Partition of Heirs Property Act." - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 27 and Title 66.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29, Chapter 27 and Title 66, relative to property.
Sponsors
Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] |
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2022 | |
2022-06-03 | Pub. Ch. 1109 | |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-05-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0918) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-25 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-25 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0918) |
2022-04-25 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-04-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 1 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0825) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2612 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1109