TN SB2167 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the commissioner of general services instead of the commissioner of finance and administration to certify by January 1 of each year to the comptroller of the treasury information necessary to identify property rendered tax exempt by acquisition by the state during the prior fiscal year for conservation and preservation. - Amends TCA Section 11-14-406 and Section 11-7-109.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the commissioner of general services instead of the commissioner of finance and administration to certify by January 1 of each year to the comptroller of the treasury information necessary to identify property rendered tax exempt by acquisition by the state during the prior fiscal year for conservation and preservation. - Amends TCA Section 11-14-406 and Section 11-7-109.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-06SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2020-06-30HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-06-30HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-06-23SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2020-06-23SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2020-06-18HousePassed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0
2020-06-18HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2020-03-05HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2020-03-03SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2020-03-02SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2020-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/2/2020
2020-02-26SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2020-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/26/2020
2020-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-02-03SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2236 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-18 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback