TN SB2163 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Effective date(s) 05/03/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Effective date(s) 05/03/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires educator preparation providers approved by the state board of education to require each candidate enrolled in the provider's educator preparation program to successfully complete at least one course each semester on reading instruction in order for the provider to retain state board approval; revises and enacts other provisions governing literacy skill instruction and educator preparation providers. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to teacher training.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] |
Sen. Frank Niceley [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Effective date(s) 05/03/2022 | |
2022-05-06 | Pub. Ch. 974 | |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0880) |
2022-04-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-03-28 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0658) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/24/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/16/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2343 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 974