TN SB2160 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Commitee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, establishes various requirements relating to literacy instruction provided to students in any of the grades kindergarten through two; establishes methods of evaluating the reading proficiency of students in any of the grades kindergarten through three; establishes requirements relating to literacy instruction provided to teaching candidates; establishes various studies and review processes relating to the state's accountability model and the licensure process for teachers. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, establishes various requirements relating to literacy instruction provided to students in any of the grades kindergarten through two; establishes methods of evaluating the reading proficiency of students in any of the grades kindergarten through three; establishes requirements relating to literacy instruction provided to teaching candidates; establishes various studies and review processes relating to the state's accountability model and the licensure process for teachers. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Commitee
2020-03-11SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2020
2020-03-11SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/18/2020
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/11/2020
2020-03-04SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/11/2020
2020-02-26SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/4/2020
2020-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-02-03SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2229 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback