TN SB2155 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 593
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, changes due dates and content requirements for reports that the department makes concerning permitting efficiency, the Tire Environmental Act, solid waste disposal, and hazardous waste management. - Amends TCA Section 4-3-506; Section 68-211-305; Section 68-212-118 and Section 68-212-212.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, changes due dates and content requirements for reports that the department makes concerning permitting efficiency, the Tire Environmental Act, solid waste disposal, and hazardous waste management. - Amends TCA Section 4-3-506; Section 68-211-305; Section 68-212-118 and Section 68-212-212.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26 Pub. Ch. 593
2020-03-26 Effective date(s) 03/20/2020
2020-03-20SenateSigned by Governor.
2020-03-13SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2020-03-11HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-03-11SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2020-03-10SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2020-03-09HousePassed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2020-03-09HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0587)
2020-03-09HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2020-03-05HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2020-03-03SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2020-03-02SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2020-03-02SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0513)
2020-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/2/2020
2020-02-26SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2020-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/26/2020
2020-02-19SenateAction deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 2/26/2020
2020-02-12SenatePlaced on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/19/2020
2020-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-02-03SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2224 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 593

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback