TN SB2155 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 843
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 843
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that a healthcare provider must not be required to pay the portion of the risk sharing payment that is attributable to the increased cost of pain relief services under any payment reform initiative involving the use of episodes of care with respect to TennCare, if certain conditions are met. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Title
As enacted, specifies that a healthcare provider must not be required to pay the portion of the risk sharing payment that is attributable to the increased cost of pain relief services under any payment reform initiative involving the use of episodes of care with respect to TennCare, if certain conditions are met. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-14 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-14 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 843 | |
2018-05-04 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2018 | |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-12 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-12 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0935) |
2018-04-12 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0810) |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2001 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 843