TN SB2152 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 897
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 897
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the reviewing and reporting duties of the advisory committee on open government and the office of open records counsel. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 4, Part 6.
Title
As enacted, revises the reviewing and reporting duties of the advisory committee on open government and the office of open records counsel. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 4, Part 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 897 | |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/19/18 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/18/18 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2287 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 897