TN SB2146 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends from January 15 to January 31 the date by which the registry of election finance must submit an annual report to the governor and the general assembly concerning the administration and enforcement of disclosure laws. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As introduced, extends from January 15 to January 31 the date by which the registry of election finance must submit an annual report to the governor and the general assembly concerning the administration and enforcement of disclosure laws. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Deferred to Summer Study |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2265 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-21 - Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to TACIR