TN SB2137 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-05 - Refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-05 - Refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a county from prohibiting an individual householder from disposing of solid waste from such householder's own household upon such householder's own land as long as the disposal does not create a public nuisance or a hazard to the public health. - Amends TCA Title 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5, relative to the authority of county governments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | Refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Energy, Ag., & Natural Resources Committee |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2628 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Government Committee