TN SB2137 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that state payments provided to local governments as reimbursement for housing state inmates at local jails be equal to the same rate as state payments provided to private prisons for housing state inmates. - Amends TCA Title 9 and Title 41.
Title
As introduced, requires that state payments provided to local governments as reimbursement for housing state inmates at local jails be equal to the same rate as state payments provided to private prisons for housing state inmates. - Amends TCA Title 9 and Title 41.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2345 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.