TN SB2136 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces from 1,000 feet to 500 feet the drug-free school zone surrounding real property comprising a public or private elementary school, middle school, secondary school, preschool, or child care agency or public library, recreational center, or park. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-432.
Title
As introduced, reduces from 1,000 feet to 500 feet the drug-free school zone surrounding real property comprising a public or private elementary school, middle school, secondary school, preschool, or child care agency or public library, recreational center, or park. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-432.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2753 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee