TN SB2132 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a health benefit plan that provides coverage for advanced metastatic cancer and associated conditions from requiring an enrollee to have failed to successfully respond to a different drug or prove a history of failure to a different drug as a prerequisite to the plan providing coverage of a prescription drug approved by the United States food and drug administration. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, prohibits a health benefit plan that provides coverage for advanced metastatic cancer and associated conditions from requiring an enrollee to have failed to successfully respond to a different drug or prove a history of failure to a different drug as a prerequisite to the plan providing coverage of a prescription drug approved by the United States food and drug administration. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2162 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020