TN SB2128 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, imposes public notice and public input requirements on a redistricting committee and upon consideration of a final redistricting plan. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 16, Part 1 and Title 3.
Title
As introduced, imposes public notice and public input requirements on a redistricting committee and upon consideration of a final redistricting plan. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 16, Part 1 and Title 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2332 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee