TN SB2126 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that the department of finance and administration must convene its annual meeting on transportation service for persons with developmental disabilities, mental illness, and serious emotional disturbance by September 15. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9, Chapter 8; Title 13, Chapter 26; Title 29, Chapter 20; Title 33; Title 37, Chapter 1; Title 55; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8; Title 9, Chapter 8; Title 13, Chapter 26; Title 29, Chapter 20; Title 33; Title 37, Chapter 1; Title 55; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to transportation service for persons with developmental disabilities, mental illness, and serious emotional disturbance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2570 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-07 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.