TN SB2124 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 775
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires the department and state board of education to provide certain information regarding Bible curricula and courses. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires the department and state board of education to provide certain information regarding Bible curricula and courses. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 775
2018-04-04SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-04SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2018-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/4/2018
2018-03-21SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/21/2018
2018-03-14SenateReset on Final calendar of Senate Education Committee
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/14/2018
2018-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2174 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 775

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback