TN SB2122 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a mechanism for legislative bill sponsors to dispute fiscal notes filed with the committee where the notes are based on information supplied by state agencies; requires state agencies to disclose all information, data, estimates, and statistics used in making the fiscal determination; authorizes the legislative office of budget analysis to hire personnel to create appropriations bills and to assist legislative members in the analysis of such bills. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 1; Title 3, Chapter 14, Part 2; Title 3, Chapter 2 and Title 3, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, creates a mechanism for legislative bill sponsors to dispute fiscal notes filed with the committee where the notes are based on information supplied by state agencies; requires state agencies to disclose all information, data, estimates, and statistics used in making the fiscal determination; authorizes the legislative office of budget analysis to hire personnel to create appropriations bills and to assist legislative members in the analysis of such bills. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 1; Title 3, Chapter 14, Part 2; Title 3, Chapter 2 and Title 3, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/13/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2096 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee