TN SB2120 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the county trustee to proceed against delinquent taxpayers by retaining an agent to collect delinquent personal property taxes, interest, costs, and attorneys' fees. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the county trustee to proceed against delinquent taxpayers by retaining an agent to collect delinquent personal property taxes, interest, costs, and attorneys' fees. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2199 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-15 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee