TN SB2118 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Pub. Ch. 549
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Pub. Ch. 549
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes existing references to "felony" thefts of amounts less than $1,000 from the definition of a non-violent property offense to align with changes made to theft valuations in the Public Safety Act of 2016, under which such thefts are misdemeanors. - Amends TCA Section 40-35-122.
Title
As enacted, removes existing references to "felony" thefts of amounts less than $1,000 from the definition of a non-violent property offense to align with changes made to theft valuations in the Public Safety Act of 2016, under which such thefts are misdemeanors. - Amends TCA Section 40-35-122.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Pub. Ch. 549 | |
2018-03-13 | Effective date(s) 03/09/2018 | |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-02-28 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-02-26 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-02-26 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/26/2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2103 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 549