TN SB2110 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, makes various changes to the licensing of and prescribing authority for advanced practice registered nurses. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 49; Title 53; Title 55; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, makes various changes to the licensing of and prescribing authority for advanced practice registered nurses. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 49; Title 53; Title 55; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2020-03-09SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/11/2020
2020-03-09SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/11/2020
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2020
2020-02-11SenateRefer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
2020-02-11SenateRecalled from Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
2020-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-02-03SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2203 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee of Health Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback