TN SB2109 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 838
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 838
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes a new boundary line between Franklin County and Marion County.
Title
As enacted, establishes a new boundary line between Franklin County and Marion County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: rec. for passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: rec. for passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Pub. Ch. 838 |
2014-05-16 | House | Effective date(s) 01/01/2015 |
2014-04-29 | House | Governor returned. |
2014-04-16 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-04-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-15 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-14 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-10 | House | S. concurred in H. am. 1 |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-09 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0 |
2014-04-09 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0976) |
2014-04-09 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 26, Nays 0 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/3/2014 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/18/2014 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2256 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 838