TN SB2103 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1056
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1056
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts "Ethan's, Hailey's, and Bentley's Law," which requires a sentencing court to order a defendant who has been convicted of vehicular homicide or aggravated vehicular homicide due to intoxication and in which the victim of the offense was the parent of a minor child to pay restitution in the form of child maintenance to each of the victim's children until each child reaches 18 years of age and has graduated from high school. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 55.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39; Title 40 and Title 55, relative to driving under the influence.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1056 | |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/14/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1834 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2022