TN SB2097 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 794
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 794
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Financial Aid Simplification for Tennesseans (FAST) Act." - Amends TCA Title 12, Chapter 3; Title 49, Chapter 1 and Title 49, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Financial Aid Simplification for Tennesseans (FAST) Act." - Amends TCA Title 12, Chapter 3; Title 49, Chapter 1 and Title 49, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Pub. Ch. 794 | |
2020-07-22 | Effective date(s) 08/01/2020, 07/01/2021 | |
2020-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-17 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-17 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0976) |
2020-06-17 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-06-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0674) |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/4/2020 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/19/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2157 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 794