TN SB2095 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1059
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1059
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a nurse practitioner or physician assistant who holds a federal DEA waiver to prescribe buprenorphine products under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 53.
Title
As enacted, authorizes a nurse practitioner or physician assistant who holds a federal DEA waiver to prescribe buprenorphine products under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 53.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1059 | |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/17/18 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/16/18 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Govt. Ops. Comm. 3-28-18 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |