TN SB2093 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes a provision requiring a report due by January 1, 2005, from the comptroller of the treasury, in conjunction with appropriate TennCare drug utilization review committees, to the speakers of the senate and house of representatives on the use of prescription drugs in nursing homes and the costs of those drugs for residents by examining prescription use overall and focusing on practices that would improve the quality of resident care while reducing costs to TennCare. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, removes a provision requiring a report due by January 1, 2005, from the comptroller of the treasury, in conjunction with appropriate TennCare drug utilization review committees, to the speakers of the senate and house of representatives on the use of prescription drugs in nursing homes and the costs of those drugs for residents by examining prescription use overall and focusing on practices that would improve the quality of resident care while reducing costs to TennCare. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2691 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.