TN SB2088 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 708
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 708
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates a procedure for school teachers, school officials, and other school personnel to follow in regard to reporting suspected child abuse or child sexual abuse. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, creates a procedure for school teachers, school officials, and other school personnel to follow in regard to reporting suspected child abuse or child sexual abuse. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] |
Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 708 | |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/11/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2461 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 708