TN SB2084 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases, from 60 to 65 days, the time in which the commissioner shall either issue or deny a permit for debris removal or stream bank stabilization activities, or schedule a public hearing on the application, after receipt of a complete application. - Amends TCA Title 69.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 69, relative to water.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2476 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-03 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.