TN SB2084 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, lengthens, from 10 days to 14 days, the time period in which the board of cosmetology and barber examiners has to publish changes to applicable laws and rules on its website from the effective date of such changes. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 3 and Title 62, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, lengthens, from 10 days to 14 days, the time period in which the board of cosmetology and barber examiners has to publish changes to applicable laws and rules on its website from the effective date of such changes. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 3 and Title 62, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1970 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in Commerce Committee