TN SB2082 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 856
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 856
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the Morgan County commission to designate by resolution a property that consists of at least 2,000 contiguous acres as the JustBeGreen Villages of America development area upon application of one or more property owners within the area for which the designation is sought. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 11 and Title 13.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the Morgan County commission to designate by resolution a property that consists of at least 2,000 contiguous acres as the JustBeGreen Villages of America development area upon application of one or more property owners within the area for which the designation is sought. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 11 and Title 13.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 856 | |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/17/18 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/16/18 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Government Operations Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2116 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 856